GREAT SHELFORD MOBILE WARDEN SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monitoring by two reliable part-time Charity Wardens of 19 full time & 14 assoc. av age 91 at home. Daily telephone checks. Visits as required but minimum weekly.Early problem intervention and help provides relief from suffering & better outcomes. Practical help is immediate and frequent according to need, often supplementing other agencies if involved. eg, Hospital discharge early arrangements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 May 1996: Standard registration
- GREAT SHELFORD WARDEN SCHEME (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER DAVID | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.74k | £15.73k | £13.11k | £20.52k | £21.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.98k | £14.68k | £14.97k | £17.55k | £19.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.50k | £5.00k | £6.50k | £3.00k | £6.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH FEBRUARY 1996 AS AMENDED 29TH APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE ELDERLY AND HOUSEBOUND RESIDENTS IN THE PARISH OF GREAT SHELFORD, SOUTH CAMBS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Caius Farm Cottages
Shelford Bottom
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 3AA
- Phone:
- 01223411885
- Email:
- beth.fosters9@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window