GILBERDYKE AND DISTRICT LEISURE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF GILBERDYKE AND ADJOINING PARISHES FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELAXATION. WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 22 May 1996: Standard registration
- GDLA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Clarkson | Chair | 15 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Dobbs | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Smith | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Normington | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Butler | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dave Branton | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.32k | £23.69k | £25.63k | £19.79k | £24.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.06k | £19.39k | £22.13k | £22.81k | £28.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.58k | £20.63k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 1998, 15 FEBRUARY 1999, 21 AUGUST 2000, 23 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 20 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GILBERDYKE IN THE COUNTY OF EAST YORKSHIRE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, FOR THE PURPOSE OF RELAXATION AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GILBERDYKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ings View Playing Fields
Main Road
Gilberdyke
HU15 2SP
- Phone:
- 07443410181
- Email:
- tonyandkat123@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window