FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S (CALNE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for maintenance and upkeep of the fabric and facilities of the Grade 1 listed St Mary's Church in Calne, Wiltshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 May 1996: Standard registration
- F O S M (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Wells | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
JOHN MICHAUX | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penny Jane Spencer | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Mrs Eve Townson Treasurer | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.71k | £693 | £1.07k | £2.22k | £3.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.31k | £3.74k | £9.10k | £5.19k | £267 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 NOVEMBER 1995 AND AMENDED 10 MARCH 1996 as amended on 30 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO HELP MAINTAIN REPAIR RESTORE PRESERVE IMPROVE BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY'S WITHIN THE PARISH OF CALNE ITS MONUMENTS FIXTURES FITTINGS FURNITURE STAINED GLASS ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE PARISH OF CALNE AND BLACKLAND IN WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Church Street
Calne
SN11 0HU
- Phone:
- 01249816522
- Email:
- friends@fosmcalne.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window