ST AUGUSTINES PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides sessional childcare for pre school children aged between 2 and a half to 4 years. The playgroup provides a structured start to the childrens academic future through educational play and toys. The staff are trained/training to at least NVQ Level 2 and are supported by a parent committee team who are responsible for the financial running of the setting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £7,250 from 6 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 May 1996: Standard registration
- 28 September 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1124222 PATA (UK)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.03k | £105.84k | £110.51k | £107.00k | £100.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.71k | £104.42k | £103.77k | £110.65k | £136.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £91.50k | £81.90k | £96.33k | £89.31k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.70k | £5.77k | £6.10k | £6.63k | £7.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 DECEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 2006 (ADOPTION OF NEW MODEL) AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE GROUP IS TO EMBODY THE VISION OF PATA THROUGH THE ENHANCEMENT OF THE DEVELOPMENT, CARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE AND ALSO OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE OF SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY (VOLUNTARY MANAGED) GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window