SAINT KYREL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helps poor Coptic students in Egypt to complete their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
- Egypt
Governance
- 23 May 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emad Elias | Chair | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
George Shehata | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Renee Michel Barsoum | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL HENEIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL FARAG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASHRAF KHIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £266.57k | £377.34k | £325.46k | £420.57k | £425.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £366.10k | £324.58k | £320.20k | £327.17k | £404.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST CHRISTIAN STUDENTS IN EGYPT.2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PREACHING THE GOSPEL.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Albury Avenue
ISLEWORTH
Middlesex
TW7 5HY
- Phone:
- 07974443623
- Email:
- info@stkyreltrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window