THE WOMEN'S GYM
Charity number: 1055647
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
No information available
Governance
Registration history:
- 29 May 1996: Standard registration
- 24 August 2001: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- ISLINGTON WOMEN'S HEALTH & RECREATION PROJECT (Working name)
- ISLINGTON WOMEN'S HEALTH AND RECREATION PROJECT (Working name)
- THE WOMEN'S GYM COMMUNITY HEALTH RESOURCE (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
No accounts and annual returns information is available for this removed charity
Governing document
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH JANAURY 1994, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12TH APRIL 1994, 28TH NOVEMBER 1995, AND 15TH APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARTICULAR IN SPORTS FOR WOMEN (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
GREATER LONDON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.