KINGSHILL HOUSE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kingshill House is a community arts centre and also offers room hire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,650 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 May 1996: Standard registration
- KINGSHILL HOUSE ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Leslie Creswick | Chair | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Michael Winterbottom | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Tapping | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR D BUSH | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Slater | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARIE DARLASTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.20k | £161.26k | £154.16k | £161.20k | £156.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.53k | £135.92k | £159.02k | £201.87k | £164.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.48k | £75.12k | £29.25k | £20.00k | £16.65k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE (HEREINAFTER KNOWN AS "KINGSHILL HOUSE") FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCAITON IN THE ARTS AND OTHER LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABLITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGSHILL HOUSE
KINGSHILL LANE
DURSLEY
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL11 4BZ
- Phone:
- 01453549133
- Email:
- admin@kingshillhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window