Financial history THE FERRERS SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1055689
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013
Total gross income £125.46k £49.47k £16.01k £19.55k £18.87k
Total expenditure £125.68k £43.02k £17.18k £31.67k £17.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A