Financial history DISABILITY ACTION IN ISLINGTON

Charity Number: 1055692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.91k £156.24k £110.86k £208.37k £203.97k
Total expenditure £53.34k £92.27k £106.63k £123.96k £167.64k
Income from government contracts £22.91k £22.91k £22.91k £22.91k £22.91k
Income from government grants £40.00k £37.50k £30.00k £30.00k £30.00k