THE JULIE ADAMS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 May 1996: Standard registration
- 05 August 2005: Removed (Does not operate)
- JULIE ADAMS FOUNDATION (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2004 | 11 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 APRIL 1995 AS AMENDED 11 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST CHILDREN RESIDENT IN SUSSEX AND HAMPSHIRE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 20 WHO ATTEND OR HAVE BEEN ACCEPTED TO ATTEND A RECOGNISED DANCE OR MUSIC ESTABLISHMENT BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR CHARITIES TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF HEART DISEASE.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE AND SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window