BERMONDSEY AND ROTHERHITHE MENTAL HEALTH SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Alievation of mental distress & suffering to residents in the Bermondsey & Rotherhithe SE16 area (Southwark Borough of London). 2. To fund raise and encourage membership to the group in furtherence of its aims & objects. 3. To meet, talk, support and advocate for & with others in Berm & Roth M.H.S. group & beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Southwark
Governance
- 19 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDY BURGESS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT RADFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAXMI PARMAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1ST FEBRUARY 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS WITHIN THE GENERAL AREA OF BERMONDSEY AND ROTHERHITHE PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIOAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF BERMONDSEY AND ROTHERHITHE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2
Browne House
Deptford Church Street
London
SE8 4SE
- Phone:
- 07595472598
- Email:
- cheryl.lygo@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window