YATTON SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Somerset
Governance
- 30 May 1996: Standard registration
- 18 December 2014: Funds received from 1032624 YATTON JUNIOR SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
- YATTON FEDERATED SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- YATTON INFANT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeh Watts | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Michelle Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rachel Cook | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE KEEBLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.31k | £8.18k | £30.42k | £63.09k | £47.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.42k | £10.62k | £28.19k | £32.96k | £36.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/03/1995 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 14/10/2014 as amended on 13 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yatton Junior School
High Street
Yatton
BRISTOL
BS49 4HJ
- Phone:
- 01934833524
- Email:
- weareysa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window