Financial history THE CASEY TRUST

Charity number: 1055726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £111.54k £87.66k £106.44k £108.81k £130.66k
Total expenditure £174.73k £128.53k £128.70k £116.14k £164.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A