SOUTH EAST WALES ENERGY AGENCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of free and impartial advice on energy efficiency and renewable energy to the public, small businesses, community groups and local authorities. The provision of grants and management of projects aimed at reducing energy consumption and relieving fuel poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 31 May 1996: Standard registration
- SOUTH EAST WALES ENERGY EFFICIENCY ADVICE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR ROBERTS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Margaret Roberts | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA BASSETT-JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.32k | £21.88k | £10.86k | £43.33k | £41.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.64k | £133.31k | £111.01k | £104.27k | £83.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED 9 MAY 1996 & 7 MARCH 2006. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO: 1. ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN SOUTH EAST WALES AND SUCH OTHER PLACE OR PLACES AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE (HEREAFTER CALLED "THE REGION") IN ENERGY CONSERVATION AND THE EFFICIENT USE OF ENERGY, LAND, WATER AND OTHER NATURAL RESOURCES, TRANSPORT AND WASTE RECYCLING; 2.TO CONSERVE AND PROTECT NATURAL RESOURCES AND ANIMAL AND PLANT LIFE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE REGION; 3. TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE INCLUDING ADVICE IN THE MORE EFFICIENT AND ECONOMICAL USE OF ENERGY IN THEIR HOMES.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST WALES (AND SUCH OTHER PLACES AS THE COMPANY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.)
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Dinch Hill
Undy
CALDICOT
Gwent
NP26 3JL
- Phone:
- 08006226110
- Email:
- advice@sewenergy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window