COASTNET - THE COASTAL NETWORK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IN LIQUIDATION COASTNET WORKS TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE IN VULNERABLE COASTAL COMMUNITIES. THIS IS DONE THROUGH EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, ESPECIALLY FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, REGENERATION ACTIVITY INCLUDING COMMUNITY PLANNING, AND THROUGH PROVISION OF TRAINING SERVICES FOR COASTAL PRACTITIONERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Morocco
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 June 1996: Standard registration
- 14 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COASTNET (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.09k | £141.44k | £258.36k | £315.05k | £426.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.74k | £157.56k | £213.13k | £311.35k | £422.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 30 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 30 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 28 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10 NOVEMBER 2003 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
IN THE UK AND WORLD-WIDE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN COASTAL MANAGEMENT AND TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT OF COASTS AND SEAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES OF COASTS AND SEAS: B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN COASTAL REGIONS: C) THE PROMOTION OF A SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION IN COASTAL REGIONS.
Area of benefit
UK AND WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window