ASSALATUR-RAHMAN ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION (UNITED KINGDOM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prayer session every Sunday from 10:30 am to 02:00 pm; Jumat prayer on Fridays Lunch time; Counselling (Marriage,spiritual,career,family issues,education etc). Fund raising for charity activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 June 1996: Standard registration
- AR-RAHMAN ASSALATU PRAYER GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adejimi Idowu Toheeb Orekoya | Chair | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sherifat Shode-Taiwo | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sherifat Olufunke Okanlawon | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abolanle Fausat Olisa | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abiodun Idowu Akerele | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olanrewaju Omotayo Taofeeq Olukotun | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olasunkanmi Jinadu Wahab | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £202.91k | £56.33k | £150.96k | £224.40k | £209.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.40k | £67.11k | £94.91k | £163.57k | £205.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11TH JUNE 1995 (AS AMENDED ON 14TH APRIL 1996) as amended on 25 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN MANY FACETS OF THE ISLAMIC CULTURE. (3) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
AssalaturRahman Islamic Association
5-9 Record Street
LONDON
SE15 1TL
- Phone:
- 07539 212 659
- Email:
- admin@assalaturrahman.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window