KAGYU RIME LING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to promote and continue the study and practice of Buddhism particularly in relation to the Karma Kagyu tradition. To this end we run regular classes in Buddhism and Buddhist Meditation and organise retreat days. Our centre in Manchester has facilities for individual retreats. We welcome visits from schools and other community organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bury
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Trafford
- Wigan
- Wirral
Governance
- 04 June 1996: Standard registration
- 14 August 2014: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 August 2014: Funds transferred to 1145791 KAGYU DECHEN BUDDHISM
- KAGYU LING (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.31k | £94.36k | £110.85k | £139.08k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.59k | £69.82k | £64.15k | £520.79k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 13 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 15 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 17 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 11 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 11 September 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 15 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 22 August 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION 23 NOV 2007
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE BUDDHIST FAITH WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE KARMA KAGU SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window