THE DAFFODIL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in awareness of the whole of the genus Narcissus, including holding shows at which growers may compete for the trophies and awards of the Society, encouraging the raising and introduction of new cultivars and educational plantings in public gardens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 June 1996: Standard registration
- DAFFODIL SOCIETY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY ENGLISH | Chair | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY ANNE CARDUS | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROGER PARSONS | Trustee | 05 March 2023 |
|
|||||
PETER FREDERICK WILKINS | Trustee | 07 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
colin william Parkes | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ERIC PICKARD | Trustee | 06 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH HARROP | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN CROUCHMAN | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAMILLA BASSETT-SMITH | Trustee | 05 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH BOXALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REGINALD NICHOLL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THERESA ROSEMARY BRAITHWAITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL HENSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE MARGARET PETHERBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM BAXTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEONARD PERCY OLIVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEREK JOHN PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.16k | £8.23k | £6.19k | £6.31k | £6.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.02k | £4.00k | £3.51k | £6.11k | £5.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 February 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/03/1996 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2003 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 11/03/2012 as amended on 01 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AWARENESS OF THE WHOLE OF THE GENUS 'NARCISSUS'
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 GREENLANDS ROAD
PEASEDOWN ST. JOHN
BATH
BA2 8EX
- Phone:
- 01761435176
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
thedaffodilsociety.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window