Financial history TAMESIDE AND GLOSSOP INTEGRATED CARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST CHARITABLE FUND

Charity Number: 1055818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £104.00k £249.00k £98.00k £51.00k £86.00k
Total expenditure £86.00k £110.00k £194.00k £91.00k £81.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A