Financial history THE ROYAL HOSPITAL OF ST. BARTHOLOMEW CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1055845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £272 £35 £13 £536 £1.82k
Total expenditure £480 £480 £480 £367 £503
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A