Accounts and annual returns FEDERATION OF PINE RIDGE AND LORRAINE PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055877
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 July 2016 24 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2015 27 June 2016 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2014 17 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2014 Not Required