Financial history FEDERATION OF PINE RIDGE AND LORRAINE PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055877
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2012 30/07/2013 30/07/2014 30/07/2015 30/07/2016
Total gross income £5.65k £8.34k £7.77k £5.59k £2.88k
Total expenditure £4.11k £7.97k £4.35k £3.15k £911
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A