Financial history HIGHBURTON PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1055886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £91.50k £98.31k £90.25k £87.97k £86.66k
Total expenditure £87.39k £81.17k £98.43k £87.73k £86.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £67.51k £64.31k
Income from government grants N/A £5.00k £2.30k £300 £300