MARLOW MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1055892
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Marlow Music Festival is held for two weeks in November and attracts hundreds of musicians of all ages and abilities who perform in front of a audience and an adjudicator winning medals and trophies. Many local schools take part and the Festival supports GSCE and A Level programmes by offering a performance platform consistent with Associated Board Exams.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020

Total income: £7,352
Total expenditure: £8,789

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 June 1996: Standard registration
  • 10 May 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 10 May 2021: Funds transferred to 1077495 YOUTH MUSIC CENTRE
  • 10 May 2021: Funds transferred to 228089 MUSICIANS BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MARLOW FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND DRAMA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £8.02k £9.23k £9.96k £10.14k £7.35k
Total expenditure £7.32k £8.38k £8.17k £8.31k £8.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.07k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2020 14 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 25 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 20 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required