Accounts and annual returns Association of Guyanese Nurses And Allied Health Professionals

Charity number: 1055894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 24 May 2024 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 10 May 2023 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 09 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required