Trustees Association of Guyanese Nurses And Allied Health Professionals
Charity number: 1055894

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMILE AVRIL WHY | Chair | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ann Mitchell | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norma Martin-Griffith | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arunes Sarkar | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eva Nyandoro | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Cecilene Why | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Campbell-Francois | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Welbourne | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vilma Todd | Trustee | 20 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Alift Harewood MBE | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Persaud | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.