1ST CHERTSEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates as a Scout Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby Athersuch | Chair | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sharp | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Cane | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judy Bowden-Black | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Roydhouse | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Brian Perry BEM | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katy Valiant | Trustee | 31 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Schofield | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Moore | Trustee |
|
||||||
SUSAN KEANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.91k | £41.96k | £76.35k | £79.22k | £58.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.68k | £15.66k | £41.86k | £69.44k | £41.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £630 | £20.24k | £13.43k | £6.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 28TH MARCH 1948, 18TH FEBRUARY 1959, 5TH MAY 1967, AND 19TH JULY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
CHERTSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
72a Park Road
WOKING
GU22 7BZ
- Phone:
- 01483725105
- Email:
- davidwsj2019@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window