Accounts and annual returns HARROGATE SHOPMOBILITY LIMITED
Charity number: 1055898
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | 31 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | 29 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | 15 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | 23 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 01 February 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | 30 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window