THE SERBIAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Variety of cultural activities including literary evenings, theatre performances and classes of English language for elderly, Serbian for non Serbian speakers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 June 1996: Standard registration
- SRPSKO DRUSTVO (Working name)
- THE SERBRIAN SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nada Nicolina Sofia Hinic | Chair | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Smiljana Kadelburg | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Julia Madhani | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dragana Slijepcevic | Trustee | 08 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.48k | £1.98k | £1.12k | £8.14k | £10.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.79k | £2.52k | £477 | £3.83k | £8.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 December 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 November 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 21ST SEPTEMBER 1995 (AS AMENDED ON 18TH MAY 1996).
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE SERBIANS OR OF SERBIAN DESCENT LIVING IN GREATER LONDON WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN A COMMOM EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PRE-SCHOOL AND SCHOOL EDUCATION AND SO AS TO ENABLE SERBIANS OR THOSE OF SERBIAN DESCENT TO GAIN EMPLOYEMENT AND INTERGRATE INTO SOCIETY AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SERBIAN HISTORY, CULTURE AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SERBIAN HISTORY, CULTURE AND HERITAGE, TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE -TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTRESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN SERBIANS AND PERSONS OF OTHER ETHNIC OR RACIAL GROUP; 2. TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SOCIETY'S CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) .
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 DAWES ROAD
LONDON
SW6 7EN
- Phone:
- 02036734898
- Email:
- office@serbiansociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window