THE ASSOCIATION OF MIRPUR WELFARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide comprehensive support, resources, and services that address the diverse needs of individuals and communities, focusing on supported living, housing, sports, health and well-being, support work, asylum seeker assistance, local facility improvement, food banks, debt relief, empowerment, career development, consultations, international emergency response, and the promotion of culture and
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
- Bangladesh
- Egypt
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Syria
- Tanzania
- Yemen
Governance
- 06 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMIR BAZ KHAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Adal Khan | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sajid Razaq | Trustee | 30 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
SADDIA JAVED | Trustee | 31 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
SOHAIL SAJID ULLAH | Trustee | 31 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAVEED ABID | Trustee | 31 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR DIN DIN | Trustee | 31 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR SALEEM SALEEM | Trustee | 31 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
SURAIYA ASLAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEIKH MOHAMMED RAFIQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS MOONA GHANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANWAR HAIDAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR ALI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.91k | £1.92k | £2.85k | £6.45k | £15.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.67k | £1.78k | £43.42k | £3.72k | £18.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 September 2024 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
1)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION,PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND FACILITATE SOCIAL WELFARE,RECREATION AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES 2)TO RELIEVE POVERTY 3)TO ESTABLISHA COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
MIRPUR CITY AND ITS ENVIRONS,REST OF PAKISTAN AND STOKE ON TRENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ASS'N OF MIRPUR WELFARE FUND
EQUALITY HOUSE
75-77 RAYMOND STREET
HANLEY
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST1 4DP
- Phone:
- 07341960199
- Email:
- sajidrazaq.mwf@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window