Accounts and annual returns STAPLETON PUBLIC HALL

Charity Number: 1055922
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 01 August 2024 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 14 February 2023 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 14 February 2023 624 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 February 2023 989 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required