ROTARY CLUB OF STROOD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We seek to help communities at a local, national and overseas level.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 06 June 1996: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 18 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN BAMPTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Denis Spiller | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Timothy Rawlings | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Hill | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Mavis Sheehan | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Mary Lloyd | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PAPADOPULOS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.88k | £6.00k | £6.38k | £11.37k | £8.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.30k | £1.00k | £2.21k | £9.66k | £12.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 11 May 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE , INSTITUTION , SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL INDULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 White Leaves Rise
Cuxton
ROCHESTER
Kent
ME2 1EG
- Phone:
- 01634723945
- Email:
- timothyrawlings@aol.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window