Financial history THE SAYERS CROFT ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1055946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £74.11k £75.25k £85.05k £60.95k £86.46k
Total expenditure £42.30k £59.06k £70.47k £70.14k £80.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.38k N/A N/A N/A