THE SAYERS CROFT ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide opportunities for mainly young people to enjoy, learn about, understand and care for the natural environment. We do this by organising activity and study programmes for local schools, out of school visits, youth clubs, local families and special needs groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 07 June 1996: Standard registration
- SAYERS CROFT (Working name)
- SAYERS CROFT TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRUCE DEAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Edward Robert Breeveld | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Morris | Trustee | 12 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Annika Marie Rice | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|||||
Carol Franklin-Adams | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mason | Trustee | 05 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA HELSTRIP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.11k | £75.25k | £85.05k | £60.95k | £86.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.30k | £59.06k | £70.47k | £70.14k | £80.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR CHILDREN, BY THE PROVISION OF AN ENVIRONMENTAL AND OUTDOOR ACTIVITY CENTRE FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SURREY AND SOUTH EAST
Contact information
- Address:
-
EXECUTIVE SECRETARY
SAYERS CROFT FIELD CENTRE
CRANLEIGH ROAD
EWHURST
CRANLEIGH
GU6 7SS
- Phone:
- 01483275541
- Email:
- trust@sayers-croft.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window