Financial history ST EBBE'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1055950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11.72k £14.73k £17.42k £19.36k £21.03k
Total expenditure £1.34k £14.67k £13.88k £25.99k £19.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A