ST EBBE'S SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1055950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY IS RUN BY PARENTS AND STAFF OF ST EBBE'S SCHOOL TO RAISE FUNDS FOR AND SUPPORT ACTIVITIES AT THE SCHOOL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £21,026
Total expenditure: £19,525

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tina Louiss Farr Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11.72k £14.73k £17.42k £19.36k £21.03k
Total expenditure £1.34k £14.67k £13.88k £25.99k £19.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 27 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 23 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 11 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 March 2022 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. EBBES C OF E FIRST SCHOOL
WHITE HOUSE ROAD
OXFORD
OX1 4NA
Phone:
01865248863
Website:

No information available