SEFTON PENSIONERS ADVOCACY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote relief to the older people of Sefton and other geographical areas that might from time to time be agreed by the Management Committee by the provision of counselling, support and advocacy services in order to assist such persons to obtain his or her full rights and privileges as a citizen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 11 June 1996: Standard registration
- 22 February 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 22 February 2020: Funds transferred to 1094825 SEFTON ADVOCACY
- S P A C (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £327.10k | £322.94k | £341.40k | £236.99k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £336.76k | £357.38k | £343.42k | £273.60k | £39.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £250.52k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.20k | £8.20k | £0 | £1.03k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED 6 JANUARY 2009 AND BY SCHEME DATED 17 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS IN SEFTON AND OTHER GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS THAT MIGHT FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE IN LAW AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN ADVICE,COUNSELLING AND ADVOCACY SERVICE IN ORDER TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO OBTAIN HIS OR HER FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS A CITIZEN.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS CLAUSE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window