FRIENDS HOUSE MOSCOW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to encourage spiritual growth and development of civil society based on mutual trust and co-operation in Russia and former countries of the USSR. We put our Quaker faith into action by working for social justice based on our belief in the presence of God in each individual. We conduct Quaker outreach and give grants for peace work, conflict resolution and community action.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Estonia
- Russia
- Ukraine
Governance
- 08 June 1996: Standard registration
- 03 February 2021: Funds received from 1145032 WESTMORLAND REGIONAL MEETING
- F H M (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Florence MORRIS | Chair | 03 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jane-Eve Straughton | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Terry Irwin | Trustee | 06 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Drakeley | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Clarkson | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Daphne Sanders | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.52k | £94.21k | £121.28k | £53.30k | £95.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.02k | £73.53k | £83.54k | £82.79k | £73.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 22ND MAY 1996
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO ENCOURAGE SPIRITUAL GROWTH IN THE COUNTRIES OF THE FORMER SOVIET UNION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FAITH AND PRACTICE OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS AND TO DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN A STABLE AND VISIBLE PRESENCE IN THE FACE OF RAPIDLY CHANGING CONDITIONS IN COUNTRIES OF THE FORMER SOVIET UNION.(2) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN NON-VIOLENT COMMUNICATION SKILLS TO GROUPS CARRYING OUT CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE FORMER SOVIET UNION AND THEREBY HELP THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
FORMER SOVIET UNION
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Lakeside
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP19 0FX
- Phone:
- 07775900605
- Email:
- info@friendshousemoscow.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window