CLARENCE ROAD EVANGELICAL CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular Christian services and activities for the community of East Cowes, outreach and support of various missions and Christian organisations both local and worldwide as an expression of faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 10 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET JAY | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER YOUNG | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Roger Fruen | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS CHARLES GLADDIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.15k | £7.83k | £8.30k | £26.77k | £41.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.96k | £5.79k | £7.65k | £16.73k | £9.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH 2) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND 3)ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY:- FOR FULL DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE DEED
Area of benefit
ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clarence Road Evangelical Church
Clarence Road
EAST COWES
PO32 6ES
- Phone:
- 01983296129
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window