ST MICHAELS YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Michael's Youth Project exists to assist and educate young persons in the area of North Hull and Orchard Park through their leisure time activities so to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £91,066 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 12 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isobel Scruton | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
ANDREW MICHAEL DORTON | Trustee | 27 January 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||
SUE LIGHTFOOT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.28k | £220.46k | £590.15k | £211.68k | £245.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £202.20k | £173.84k | £193.32k | £213.56k | £351.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £60.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £93.25k | N/A | N/A | £81.18k | £91.07k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £588.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £2.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £64 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £193.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.26k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 1996 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 2001 as amended on 05 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the St. Michael's Youth Project are to educate and assist young persons in the area of Hull and East Riding primarily in North Hull and Orchard Park through their leisure time activities so to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to full maturity as individuals and members of society and that their conditions of life may be improved.
Area of benefit
NORTH HULL AND ORCHARD PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST MICHAELS YOUTH PROJECT
ORCHARD PARK ROAD
HULL
HU6 9BX
- Phone:
- 01482806015
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window