HARTLEPOOL COMMUNITY STUDIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide easy access to recording, rehearsal, training and live performance facilities giving the whole of the community the opportunity to participate in the arts and with special emphasis given to education of unwaged people in Hartlepool and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 12 June 1996: Standard registration
- THE STUDIO (Working name)
- DURHAM STREET STUDIO (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Lee Jobson | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Barwell | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Garner | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Armstrong | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BARNES | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.89k | £28.16k | £17.95k | £40.96k | £80.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.43k | £27.31k | £37.31k | £55.79k | £75.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 MAY 1996 AND 16 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 8TH FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION AND PRACTICE OF PARTICIPATORY ARTS AND ASSOCIATED DISCIPLINES. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF UNEMPLOYED PERSONS RESIDENT IN HARTLEPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE PROVISIONS OF SUCH TRAINING FACILITIES AS WILL ENABLE THOSE PERSONS TO ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP VOCATIONAL SKILLS.
Area of benefit
HARTLEPOOL AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE STUDIO
TOWER STREET
HARTLEPOOL
TS24 7HQ
- Phone:
- 01429424440
- Website:
-
thestudiohartlepool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window