THE TREASURE CHEST (BREAST CANCER SUPPORT) GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support and raise funds for patients had/having surgery or treatment for Breast Cancer in Glan Clwyd Hospital, Bodelwyddan, Denbighshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Conwy
- Denbighshire
- Flintshire
Governance
- 10 June 1996: Standard registration
- THE TREASURE CHEST BREAST CANCER SUPPORT GROUP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAI SOLOMON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shiela Jones | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nerys Chadwick | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL RAINFORD | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MYRNA WYATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.12k | £4.38k | £5.28k | £9.14k | £11.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.19k | £943 | £4.36k | £5.83k | £26.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 20 March 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/05/1996 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS FROM THE CATCHMENT AREA OF GLAN CLWYD HOSPITAL WHO, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, ARE SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED FROM BREAST CANCER, AND IN PARTICULAR BY: (I) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS. (II) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ITEMS OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES TO GLAN CLWYD HOSPITAL, THE BETSI CADWALADER UNIVERSITY HEALTH BOARD AND OUR LOCAL HOSPICE ST. KENTAIGANS, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF GLAN CLWYD HOSPITAL,BODELWYDDAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Conwy Avenue
Rhuddlan
RHYL
Clwyd
LL18 5PW
- Phone:
- 07950935705
- Email:
- treasurechest.79@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
Treasurechest.BreastCancerSupportGroup
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window