Accounts and annual returns DOVERIDGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1056018
Charity reporting is up to date (180 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 26 January 2025 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 27 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 07 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required