HEREFORDSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Herefordshire Federation of Women's Institutes was formed in 1920 and has its office and headquarters in its own property, WI House, in Hereford. Committee meetings and some classes are held there. The office is run by the Federation Secretary with the Federation Book-Keeper and Federation Administrator who are paid employees of the Federation and by its members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- H F W I (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET ELAINE SIMCOCK | Chair | 14 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joy Edwards | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Voogd | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Jane Voogd | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Walker | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Jaquelynn Anne Woodhouse | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA MADGEN | Trustee | 27 April 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.02k | £53.12k | £35.68k | £56.04k | £56.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.06k | £51.66k | £41.68k | £70.20k | £67.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £6.06k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE MOVEMENT IN HEREFORDSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF HEREFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEREFORDSHIRE FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES
WI House
90 St Owens Street
Hereford
HR1 2QD
- Phone:
- 01432272268
- Email:
- fedsec.hfwie@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window