CENTRAL LANGUAGE SCHOOL, CAMBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance public education by the teaching of English in a Christian Language School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 June 1996: Standard registration
- CENTRAL SCHOOL OF ENGLISH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL JOHN PRIESTLEY | Chair |
|
||||||
Richard Anthony Colledge | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Iren Lowe | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER BARTOW WYLIE | Trustee | 05 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bromwich | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MICHAEL GELSON FARRER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELIZABETH FRANCES WATTS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.52k | £192.71k | £80.44k | £146.06k | £261.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £286.45k | £216.37k | £118.29k | £159.64k | £234.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND MAY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE TEACHING OF ENGLISH LANGUAGE TO STUDENTS FROM OVERSEAS. (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY THE GIVING OF GRANTS TO SUCH INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Central Language School
41 St. Andrews Street
Cambridge
CB2 3AR
- Phone:
- 01223502004
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window