Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH ABBOTS LANGLEY

Charity number: 1056097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.93k £17.02k £8.97k £14.10k £14.91k
Total expenditure £11.30k £1.67k £3.08k £10.91k £12.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £500