THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH ABBOTS LANGLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various social activities to raise funds to support the maintenance of the fabric of St Lawrence Church Abbots Langley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 June 1996: Standard registration
- THE FIRENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH ABBOTS LANGLEY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Robert Arbon | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Norman James Meldrum | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ann Deane | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Mason | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|||||
William James Howard Sanderson | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV DR PETER WADDELL | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.93k | £17.02k | £8.97k | £14.10k | £14.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.30k | £1.67k | £3.08k | £10.91k | £12.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH DECEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION REPAIR RESTORATION IMPROVEMENT AND ORNAMENTATION OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ABBOTS LANGLEY
Area of benefit
ABBOTS LANGLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Church Office
High Street
ABBOTS LANGLEY
Hertfordshire
WD5 0AS
- Phone:
- 01923 267383
- Email:
- fosltreasurer21@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window