Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST LAWRENCE CHURCH ABBOTS LANGLEY
Charity number: 1056097

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Robert Arbon | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Norman James Meldrum | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ann Deane | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Mason | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|||||
William James Howard Sanderson | Trustee | 08 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV DR PETER WADDELL | Trustee | 19 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.