Financial history CYLCH MEITHRIN EGLWYSWRW

Charity Number: 1056115
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.12k £29.10k £42.33k £42.33k £38.36k
Total expenditure £19.07k £20.55k £25.29k £25.29k £42.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £32.62k £7.58k