EVANGELICAL CONCERN FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We empower disabled peoples' lives by educating communities on inclusivity and raising funds for mobility aids, therapy, and assistive technologies. We offer tailored activities, events, skills training, entrepreneurial hubs, scholarships, and internships. Our campaigns highlight challenges for disabled people while supporting independence, career-oriented growth with access to healthcare support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 14 June 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Babatunde Williams | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|||||
ANTOINETTE OKOIYE | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLOTHILDA KEHINDE ADEOGO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.00k | £2.50k | £3.50k | £8.00k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.70k | £2.25k | £3.20k | £7.50k | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 February 2021 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD MAY 1996
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL AND OTHER DISABILITIES AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE THE INTERGRATION AND PARTICIPATION OF SUCH PERSONS IN CHURCH LIFE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND TO PROMOTE AN AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS AMONGST CHURCHES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT.(B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (C) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 PEEL CLOSE
LONDON
E4 6XU
- Phone:
- 02082819682
- Email:
- ecpd2002@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window